WY HB0237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; providing that the specific purpose sales and use tax can be used for roadway construction or other transportation infrastructure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Transportation infrastructure-local option.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |