WY HB0237 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to unemployment insurance; defining misconduct connected with work for purposes of the Wyoming Employment Security Law Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unemployment insurance-worker misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0107 |
2013-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0107 |
2013-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA0107 | |
2013-02-26 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-25 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-25 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-04 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-01 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2013-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |