WY HB0231 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to net metering; amending the definition of net metering; providing that an electric utility may authorize a customer-generator to use a net metering system with a generating capacity of greater than twenty-five kilowatts; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Net metering amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateDid Not Consider for Introduction
2019-02-26 Senate Did Not Consider for Introduction
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 33-26-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback