WY HB0231 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 185 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to firearms; allowing those having previously pled guilty or been convicted of a felony to possess antique firearms; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm possession-allow felons antique firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0231JC002: 25-1-4-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0231JC002: 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0231JC002: 25-1-4-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0231JC002: 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Concur:Failed 29-31-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 185 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0120
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0120
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0120
2017-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0120
2017-03-03SenateAdopted HB0231JC002: 25-1-4-0-0
2017-03-03HouseAdopted HB0231JC002: 58-2-0-0-0
2017-03-02 Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2017-03-02 Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2017-03-02 JCC Requested a New Committee to be Appointed
2017-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-02-24HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-02-24HouseConcur:Failed 29-31-0-0-0
2017-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2017-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-10SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-10SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-03House3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0
2017-02-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-30HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback