WY HB0230 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school safety and security; establishing supplemental financial assistance available to school districts for school resource officers for protection and safety of schools; specifying eligibility for and distribution of assistance and granting rulemaking authority for program administration; establishing a task force through the department of education addressing school safety and security planning; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School safety and security.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Winters [R] | Rep. James Byrd [D] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Keith Gingery [R] |
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H Reconsidered (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - H02 Returned With Recommendations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H Reconsidered (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - H02 Returned With Recommendations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-02-04 | House | Failed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | House | Returned With Recommendations |
2013-01-25 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-25 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2013-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |