WY HB0229 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0095
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0095
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to regulation of natural gas; exempting natural gas used as a transportation fuel from regulation by the public service commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Regulation of natural gas as a transportation fuel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0095 |
2013-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0095 |
2013-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA0095 | |
2013-02-25 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-22 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2013-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |