WY HB0228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways; removing the criminal state of mind element related to traveling on closed highways; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Highway closure-violation amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | COW:Failed 24-34-2-0-0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-11 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |