WY HB0228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to transportation and wildlife; providing for the distribution of revenue to the wildlife conservation account; authorizing and requiring a study of motor vehicle collisions with big game animals on highways as specified; requiring a study of big game animals killed or injured along railroads as specified; authorizing wildlife conservation efforts related to the transportation system as specified; authorizing expenditure of funds; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highway and wildlife safety studies and improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2019-02-26SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
2019-01-30House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback