WY HB0228 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public lands; creating the task force on the transfer of federal lands; requiring a report from the attorney general on possible legal recourses available to compel the federal government to relinquish ownership and management of specified federal lands in Wyoming; requiring a study and report by the task force to the joint agriculture, state and public lands and water resources interim committee as specified; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Transfer of federal lands-study.
Sponsors
Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] |
Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0101 |
2013-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0101 |
2013-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA0101 | |
2013-02-25 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-25 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-04 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-01 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |