WY HB0227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to consumer protection; requiring notice and disclosure of automatic renewal provisions in consumer contracts as specified; providing violations constitute a deceptive trade practice under the Wyoming Consumer Protection Act; providing exemptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Automatic renewal of consumer contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |