WY HB0224 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to penalties for violating fire restrictions; increasing penalties for entry into or use of any area closed by a board of county commissioners because of extreme fire danger; providing an exception; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Burn order violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-10 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0 |
2015-02-09 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-06 | Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |