WY HB0223 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public records; authorizing denial of inspection of records of applications for president of institutions of higher education and associated records as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public records-institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-08 | Governor Did Not Sign Enrolled Act HEA0001 | |
2013-02-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2013-02-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2013-02-05 | Assigned Number HEA0001 | |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-28 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |