WY HB0221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 71 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 71 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to labor and employment; increasing bond or other security required for nonresident employers; expanding application of bond or security funds; increasing the penalty for violations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Nonresident employer bonding requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 71 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0049 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0049 |
2017-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0049 |
2017-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0049 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |