WY HB0218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to bias motivated crimes; creating additional elements for bias motivated crimes; creating enhanced penalties for bias motivated crimes; providing that the court shall consider whether a crime is bias motivated during sentencing; creating a civil cause of action; providing for antibias training of peace officers as specified; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bias motivated crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-02 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0218 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0218.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0218.pdf |