WY HB0217 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to environmental quality; providing that a study shall be commissioned to determine the feasibility of the state of Wyoming becoming an agreement state under the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 for the licensing of source material and source material recovery and standards for radiation protection; requiring a report; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Atomic Energy Act agreement state study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0100
2013-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0100
2013-02-25 Assigned Number HEA0100
2013-02-25HouseDid Concur
2013-02-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-21SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-14SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-13SenateRereferred to S02
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-13SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2013-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-02-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-05 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-04HousePassed CoW
2013-02-04 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-04HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-01HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2013-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback