WY HB0216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child custody and visitation; prohibiting the granting of custody, visitation or access to records to persons who have committed sexual assault as specified; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sexual assault-custody rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |