WY HB0215 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - COW:Failed 14-45-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - COW:Failed 14-45-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating the crimes of drug induced infant homicide and drug induced infant abuse; amending definition of abuse for provisions related to child protective services as specified; providing enhanced penalties in cases where a person delivers controlled substances to a pregnant woman; providing for presumptions and affirmative defenses; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Drug induced infant endangerment.
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Blackburn [R] | Rep. Roy Edwards [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. Lars Lone [R] |
Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Nathan Winters [R] | Sen. Wyatt Agar [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - COW:Failed 14-45-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - COW:Failed 14-45-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - COW:Failed 14-45-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-30 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | COW:Failed 14-45-1-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-30 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |