WY HB0215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0079
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - President Signed HEA No. 0079
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state investments; decreasing amount allowed to be invested in industrial development bonds; decreasing overall amount allowed to be invested for specific public purposes; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State investments for a public purpose.
Sponsors
Rep. John Patton [R] | Rep. Kathy Coleman [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] |
Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Amendment Adopted (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0079 |
2013-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0079 |
2013-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA0079 | |
2013-02-21 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Laid Back Pursuant to SR 7-3 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Laid Back Pursuant to SR 7-3 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-01 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-31 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |