WY HB0214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to real estate brokers; decreasing the length of time licensed real estate brokers must keep and maintain records of real estate transactions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate brokers-retention of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 140
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0090
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0090
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0090
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0090
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-12Senate:Rerefer to S03 - Revenue
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2019-02-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback