WY HB0214 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; limiting eligibility for Hathaway opportunity scholarships to attendance at a community college as specified; specifying applicability; modifying reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hathaway scholarship-college attendance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-02 (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
2011-02-07 (S) Introduced and Referred to S04; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
2011-02-07 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-02-04 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harvey, Illoway, Kasperik, Kroeker, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish and Wallis. Nays: Representative(s) Connolly, Davison, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Greear, Harshman, Hunt, Jaggi, Krone, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Peasley, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Brown, Gay and Miller. Ayes 42 Nays 15 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-04 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-04 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-03 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-02 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-02 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-02 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-01-31 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-31 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Burkhart, Connolly, Kroeker, Madden and Teeters Nayes: Representative(s) Freeman and Krone Absent: Representative(s) Loucks Ayes 6 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 1 Conflicts 0
2011-01-31 (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-25 (H) Introduced and Referred to H04
2011-01-25 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback