WY HB0213 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; providing for a study of the benefits of the state of Wyoming entering into an international fuel tax agreement; and providing for an effective date.
Title
International fuel tax agreement-study.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Winters [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] |
Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H03; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2013-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0213.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0213.pdf |