WY HB0212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; reducing the waiting period for expungement of felony and misdemeanor convictions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Expungement for restoration of rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Marshall Burt [L] | Rep. Andrea LeBeau [D] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Karlee Provenza [D] |
Rep. Robert Wharff [R] | Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-09 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-02 | Bill Number Assigned |