WY HB0212 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 184 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to workers compensation; authorizing the division to determine the chargeability of claims costs to an employer's experience rating; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers compensation-claim apportionment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - Concur:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 184 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0096
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0096
2015-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0096
2015-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0096
2015-03-03HouseConcur:Passed 55-4-1-0-0
2015-03-02HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2015-02-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-26SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2015-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-09House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2015-02-06House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-05HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-04HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-04 Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2015-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback