WY HB0211 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; mandating health insurance coverage parity for mental health and substance use disorders as specified; specifying applicability; authorizing rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health and substance use coverage parity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 142
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0089
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0089
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0089
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0089
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback