WY HB0207 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; revising provisions relating to political party affiliation changes by electors; specifying electors affiliated with a major political party shall change their affiliation to another major political party at least fourteen (14) days prior to a primary election; providing conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Change in party affiliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-30 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |