WY HB0207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to corporations, partnerships and associations; altering licensing fees as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business licensing fees-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14Senate3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-07SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 45-13-2-0-0
2019-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-25HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-25HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback