WY HB0207 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to animals; creating the neglected and abandoned animals grant program; providing for administration of the grant program by the department of agriculture; providing for eligibility; providing for an application process; providing criteria for awarding a grant under the program; providing rulemaking authority; creating an account; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Neglected and abandoned animals-grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26HouseCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2013-02-04HouseIntroduced and referred to H05; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2013-01-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback