WY HB0205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - COW:Failed 23-33-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; lowering the minimum age at which a person may take a big or trophy game animal; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Big and trophy game animals-minimum hunting age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - COW:Failed 23-33-4-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Failed 23-33-4-0-0
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback