WY HB0203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 17-42-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to community colleges; providing an appropriation for community college campus safety and security projects; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges-safety and security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - COW:Failed 17-42-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Failed 17-42-1-0-0
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
2019-01-25House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback