WY HB0202 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; providing for an exemption from the imposition of state sales and use tax on equipment purchased for inclusion in an existing electrical generating facility needed to meet federal environmental protection agency requirements as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
EPA equipment requirements-tax exemption.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirkbride [R] | Rep. Richard Cannady [R] | Rep. Norine Kasperik [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] |
Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Sen. Fred Emerich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0202.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0202.pdf |