WY HB0200 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public utilities; requiring the public service commission to establish electricity generation portfolio standards for public utilities; limiting the recovery of costs for the retirement of coal fired electric generation facilities; authorizing the public service commission to grant reasonable rate recovery for public utilities as specified; authorizing a surcharge; requiring reports; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reliable and dispatchable low-carbon energy standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-10-2-0-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Assigned Chapter Number 144
2020-03-24 Governor Signed HEA No. 0079
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0079
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0079
2020-03-11 Assigned Number HEA No. 0079
2020-03-11HouseConcur:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2020-03-11HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-10-2-0-1
2020-03-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-06SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-05SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2020-03-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-28House3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-24HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 50-10-0-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback