WY HB0198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to compulsory attendance; modifying mandatory attendance requirements as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-compulsory attendance.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] | Sen. Jim Anderson [R] |
Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 |
2015-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2015-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0198.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0198.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0198.pdf |