WY HB0197 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to controlled substances; providing penalties for possession of marihuana in plant form and tetrahydrocannabinol products in specified amounts; creating an elevated misdemeanor offense for possession of such products as specified; amending a provision related to determination of weight; making a conforming amendment; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marihuana and THC products policy reform act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 28-30-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Failed 28-30-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03Housepostponed indefinitely
2017-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2017-03-02HouseConcur:Failed 28-30-2-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-23SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2017-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-03House3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0
2017-02-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-31HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2017-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback