WY HB0196 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - COW:Failed 21-40-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - COW:Failed 21-40-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; requiring the office of homeland security to establish a reporting system for concerns regarding critical infrastructure as specified; authorizing the governor to specify countries and companies as threats to critical infrastructure; providing definitions; specifying applicability; providing an appropriation; authorizing positions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming infrastructure protection act.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Troy McKeown [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - COW:Failed 21-40-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-30 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | COW:Failed 21-40-1-0-0 |
2023-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-30 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |