WY HB0194 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming department of agriculture; increasing specified fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming department of agriculture fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Concur:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Amendment adopted 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 26 | |
2020-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0022 | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0022 |
2020-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0022 | |
2020-03-04 | House | Concur:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-17 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-16-1-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |