WY HB0194 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 189
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Medicaid; making legislative findings; providing for air ambulance transport coverage under Medicaid as specified; requiring a copay; creating an account; imposing a premium assessment on certain insurers for the purposes of this act; requiring reimbursements from state agencies for air ambulance transport services; authorizing the submission of federal Medicaid state plan amendments and other necessary waivers and agreements; classifying air ambulance subscription plans as disability insurance; making conforming amendments; requiring reports and certain other actions; requiring the promulgation of rules; specifying applicability; providing sunset dates; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air ambulance coverage-Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 54-4-2-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 189
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0112
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0112
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0112
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0112
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 54-4-2-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-31House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback