WY HB0193 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - COW:Failed 2-24-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to county officers; amending the duties of county attorneys to allow for county attorneys to provide legal services to special districts as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County attorneys-representation of special districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-26 - Senate - COW:Failed 2-24-4-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26SenateCOW:Failed 2-24-4-0-0
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-25SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2021-03-22SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-03-19SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-19House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2021-03-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-17HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-10HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-10HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-03-04HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-02 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback