WY HB0193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workforce development; creating the Wyoming career technical pathway trust fund; authorizing funding for career technical training, internships, opportunities and services; requiring rulemaking; conforming provisions; authorizing a contract position; providing for appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming career technical pathway workforce strategy.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. David Northrup [R] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-29 | House | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0 |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |