WY HB0193 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to domestic relations; providing for civil penalty for failure to comply with child custody order; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child custody enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Gay [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. James Byrd [D] | Rep. Ken Esquibel [D] |
Rep. Lee Filer [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H01; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0193.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0193.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0193.htm |