WY HB0192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to court fees; increasing the court automation fee; conforming provisions; providing an exception for state agencies; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Court automation fee-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted HB0192JC001: 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Adopted HB0192JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted HB0192JC001: 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Adopted HB0192JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted HB0192JC001: 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 52-8-0-0- (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Adopted HB0192JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted HB0192JC001: 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Adopted HB0192JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Adopted HB0192JC001: 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 52-8-0-0- (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0075 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0075 |
2017-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0075 |
2017-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0075 | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Adopted HB0192JC001: 26-0-4-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | Adopted HB0192JC001: 45-15-0-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-23 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-23 | House | Concur:Failed 2-58-0-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Concur:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 |
2017-02-22 | House | Concur:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 |
2017-02-21 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-26 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |