WY HB0191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to driver's licenses; authorizing a medical alert designation on a person's driver's license or identification card; providing immunity from civil and criminal liability as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses-medical alert designation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 139
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0083
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0083
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0083
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0083
2019-02-22HouseConcur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-21HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-07SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-02-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-31House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-25HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-25HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback