WY HB0188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to intergovernmental cooperation; authorizing the state loan and investment board to make loans to irrigation or water conservancy districts as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Irrigation and water conservancy district loans.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Clausen [R] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] |
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. John Winter [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-7-2-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-7-2-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 123 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0071 | |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0071 |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0071 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0071 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-30 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-29 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-7-2-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-09 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-02 | Bill Number Assigned |