WY HB0188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to district courts; amending filing fees for probate and civil cases as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
District court filing fees-2.
Sponsors
Rep. William Pownall [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Joann Dayton-Selman [D] |
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2017-02-27 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-31 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-26 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-2-0-0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |