WY HB0188 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Occupational Therapy Practice Act; amending definitions; adding definitions; amending licensing requirements; requiring national certification for licensure; providing for re-entry of previously licensed persons; amending the experience requirement for board membership; amending board meeting requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Board of occupational therapy amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0188.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0188.pdf |