WY HB0187 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to campaign finance reporting; modifying persons required to file campaign receipts reports; removing a requirement that contributors annually renew their consent to automatic contributions; limiting contributions by political action committees; adjusting contribution limits to candidates for statewide political office; requiring amendment of campaign finance reports as specified; providing and modifying criminal penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Campaign finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] | Sen. John Hines [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted HB0187JC01 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Adopted HB0187JC01 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 18 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Adopted HB0187JC01 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 18 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0106 |
2013-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0106 |
2013-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA0106 | |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted HB0187JC01 |
2013-02-25 | House | Adopted HB0187JC01 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-21 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-21 | House | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-15 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-15 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-01 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-01 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |