WY HB0187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Gingery, Greene, Illoway, Jaggi, Krone, Moniz, Peasley, Petroff, Quarberg, Vranish, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Connolly, Edmonds, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Kasperik, Kroeker, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Throne Ayes 22 Nays 37 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Gingery, Greene, Illoway, Jaggi, Krone, Moniz, Peasley, Petroff, Quarberg, Vranish, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Connolly, Edmonds, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Kasperik, Kroeker, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Throne Ayes 22 Nays 37 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; providing for issuance of administrative subpoenas upon request of a peace officer; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Administrative subpoenas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Craft, Davison, Eklund, Gingery, Greene, Illoway, Jaggi, Krone, Moniz, Peasley, Petroff, Quarberg, Vranish, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Connolly, Edmonds, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Goggles, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Kasperik, Kroeker, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters and Wallis. Excused: Representative(s) Throne Ayes 22 Nays 37 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-02-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-31 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brechtel, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Krone and Throne Nayes: Representative(s) Peasley Excused: Representative(s) Nicholas B Ayes 7 Nays 1 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-31 | (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0187.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0187.pdf |