WY HB0186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; prohibiting enforcement of traffic violations using an automated traffic enforcement system; prohibiting use of information obtained through an automated traffic enforcement system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Automated traffic law enforcement-prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - H08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-04 | House | H08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |