WY HB0185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; providing for assessment of the state alcoholic beverage markup on wine sold directly to consumers by wineries and out of state shippers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wine-assessment on direct sales and shipment.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-22 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0185 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0185.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0185.pdf |