WY HB0180 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to agriculture, livestock and other animals; requiring the Wyoming livestock board to establish a communication protocol to provide information related to brucellosis testing; requiring the state veterinarian to provide information to livestock owners regarding brucellosis testing; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Brucellosis testing-notification requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 121 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0054 | |
2023-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2023-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2023-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0054 | |
2023-02-21 | House | Concur:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-21 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |