WY HB0180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to liquor licenses; creating a cultural event permit; providing restrictions on cultural event permits; providing for a fee; providing for rules and regulations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Liquor licenses-cultural event permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0180.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0180.pdf |